MAGIC ME

Charity number: 328331
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £24.57k £35.43k £0 N/A
Income from government grants £14.89k £15.23k £15.48k £15.48k £15.48k
Other income £246.81k £337.98k £405.06k £287.03k £278.13k
Total expenditure £249.69k £334.48k £316.09k £338.13k £388.38k