THE OAKDALE TRUST

Charity number: 218827
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £311.11k £353.44k £431.31k £977.98k £367.16k
Total expenditure £298.10k £311.23k £303.64k £399.24k £390.90k