THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN, RIVERHEAD WITH DUNTON GREEN

Charity number: 1128522
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £109,843 £134,479 £88,220 £99,613 £102,789
Total expenditure £115,602 £127,589 £97,040 £94,865 £85,883