WELSH GUARDS CHARITY

Charity number: 1152766
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £713,358 £492,859 £395,198 £342,762 £476,424
Total expenditure £620,337 £584,465 £371,032 £454,283 £501,862