SOUTH HAMS SOCIETY

Charity number: 263985
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Other income £1,571 £1,335 £1,422 £1,326 £2,398
Total expenditure £2,036 £902 £1,276 £1,491 £1,431