KENT, SURREY & SUSSEX AIR AMBULANCE TRUST

Charity number: 1021367
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Income from government contracts £81,066 £0 £623,003 £623,524 £1,200,000
Income from government grants £0 £1,853,182 £0 £1,000,000 N/A
Other income £10,612,292 £12,351,653 £11,803,670 £12,489,199 £13,644,601
Total expenditure £8,351,173 £9,359,751 £9,559,172 £10,971,574 £14,140,259