HISTORIC AIRCRAFT FLIGHT TRUST

Charity number: 1024043
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Other income £0 £12,015 £24,703 £23,401 £20,018
Total expenditure £7,158 £16,440 £22,137 £24,605 £20,636