DEAFINITELY INDEPENDENT

Charity number: 1027567
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Income from government contracts £740,778 £698,622 £706,524 £722,377 £828,277
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £28,022 £2,430 £41,469 £23,707 £8,667
Total expenditure £808,888 £773,171 £723,691 £649,702 £690,019