THE EVELYN OLDFIELD UNIT

Charity number: 1044681
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £75,079 £0 N/A
Income from government grants £40,836 £10,980 £75,079 £95,800 £25,000
Other income £182,297 £125,202 £65,189 £100,329 £125,377
Total expenditure £250,043 £217,647 £195,402 £169,757 £189,433