PostScript 360 Limited

Charity number: 1056508
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Income from government contracts £55,728 £53,727 £58,072 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £701,266 £4,623 £155 £27,211 £16,080
Total expenditure £115,307 £112,909 £107,310 £101,918 £103,288