DARTMOUTH UNITED CHARITIES

Charity number: 203399
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
30/04/2015 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Other income £256,468 £330,340 £338,732 £386,787 £429,308
Total expenditure £193,534 £244,268 £160,091 £199,505 £187,037