ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PROTECTION OF BIRDS

Charity number: 207076
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Income from government contracts £648.42k £926.60k £362.10k £2.36m £1.83m
Income from government grants £14.02m £12.04m £11.54m £13.38m £13.67m
Other income £118.20m £124.03m £122.28m £122.62m £127.09m
Total expenditure £128.19m £134.06m £135.09m £136.60m £131.79m