THE INSTITUTE OF MARINE ENGINEERING, SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY

Charity number: 212992
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
30/09/2015 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £2,699,676 £2,855,206 £2,823,562 £3,488,661 £3,196,229
Total expenditure £3,942,051 £3,947,989 £3,812,286 £3,734,381 £3,335,391