CHARITY FOR THE REPARATION OF THE CHURCH AND SUSTENTATION OF THE POOR (OTHERWISE KNOWN AS ARCHER, PEARCE AND JEAME'S CHARITY)

Charity number: 220487
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £47,519 £48,964 £48,964 £266,979 £58,792
Total expenditure £46,819 £56,953 £56,953 £35,220 £55,168