CABMEN'S SHELTER FUND

Charity number: 236108
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £85.08k £93.53k £91.65k £97.83k £109.04k
Total expenditure £78.79k £92.66k £95.22k £98.08k £82.93k