ESTA STRING TEACHERS ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity number: 266193
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
30/09/2015 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £146,000 £138,638 £192,095 £234,688 £297,756
Total expenditure £139,726 £145,205 £192,520 £239,811 £275,261