THE RESEARCH INTO LOST KNOWLEDGE ORGANISATION TRUST

Charity number: 266677
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
01/01/2016 01/01/2017 01/01/2018 01/01/2019 01/01/2020
Total income £8.62k £9.07k £5.24k £5.68k £3.37k
Total expenditure £7.51k £7.27k £5.75k £5.66k £3.44k