EUROPEAN-ATLANTIC GROUP

Charity number: 274898
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Other income £32,668 £2,443 £2,227 £4,745 £1,252
Total expenditure £72,176 £35,167 £28,813 £24,645 £2,191