WILLIAM JOHN MILLS COTTAGES

Charity number: 275488
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
05/04/2015 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £183,144 £182,160 £182,407 £191,948 £194,722
Total expenditure £106,931 £92,109 £94,778 £117,871 £128,258