DOMINICA OVERSEA NATIONALS ASSOCIATION AID - DOMINICA DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity number: 279643
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Other income £4,277 £13,747 £9,260 £25,920 £15,974
Total expenditure £3,850 £11,656 £7,119 £25,908 £19,526