CANTERBURY THEATRE AND FESTIVAL TRUST

Charity number: 279714
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £264,299 £221,075 £37,964 £5,564 N/A
Other income £670,070 £500,973 £742,950 £771,225 £632,411
Total expenditure £852,621 £746,792 £850,377 £793,937 £729,184