OXFORD THEATRE GUILD

Charity number: 294056
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £51,422 £80,572 £50,579 £57,705 £55,937
Total expenditure £61,894 £65,977 £58,657 £61,118 £55,810