HEATH END VILLAGE HALL AND RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 301735
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £23,885 £30,238 £20,866 £25,566 £28,297
Total expenditure £36,436 £18,828 £16,867 £26,377 £26,923