BUILDING CRAFTS COLLEGE

Charity number: 312856
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
30/06/2015 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £781.57k £1.07m £1.16m £1.06m
Income from government grants £744.17k £0 £0 N/A £1.06m
Other income £2.05m £1.91m £1.91m £1.83m £678.62k
Total expenditure £2.80m £2.62m £2.89m £2.99m £2.84m