THE KARUNA TRUST

Charity number: 327461
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £1,829,991 £1,755,809 £1,790,776 £1,821,666 £1,895,189
Total expenditure £1,860,600 £1,811,302 £1,917,497 £1,860,764 £1,842,600