INTERCOUNTRY ADOPTION CENTRE

Charity number: 1067313
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Income from government contracts £467,440 £246,471 £286,975 £383,942 £509,056
Income from government grants £93,580 £73,218 £141,706 £293,627 N/A
Other income £405,920 £785,769 £1,245,873 £1,353,924 £1,665,344
Total expenditure £946,176 £1,118,215 £1,632,564 £1,969,915 £2,159,240