THE CHRISTIAN CARE TRUST

Charity number: 1071039
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
30/09/2015 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £49,608 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £437,790 £701,274 £407,330 £522,411 £442,881
Total expenditure £364,172 £412,875 £380,965 £414,525 £434,080