THE ROMEERA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1076325
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
05/04/2015 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Other income £14.98k £86.18k £3.63k £138 £3.03k
Total expenditure £223.00k £310.47k £1.07m £297.60k £192.40k