MASSADA CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1068534
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Other income £12.52k £9.15k £8.49k £8.17k £7.43k
Total expenditure £10.88k £9.65k £7.99k £2.46k £2.46k