SEXUALLY TRANSMITTED INFECTION RESEARCH FOUNDATION (STIRF)

Charity number: 1075316
Charity reporting is 268 days late
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
05/04/2015 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Other income £68 £68 £40,041 £48 £90,043
Total expenditure £19,427 £26,155 £828 £6,333 £60,815