THE ANDREW CROFT MEMORIAL FUND

Charity number: 1078106
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
30/06/2015 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £10,607 £15,436 £42,655 £7,486 £18,684
Total expenditure £9,449 £6,136 £8,394 £10,491 £5,218