WOOD STREET MISSION

Charity number: 1078337
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Other income £306,906 £445,905 £524,062 £437,507 £826,458
Total expenditure £294,442 £409,347 £466,057 £521,008 £664,084