THE KESWICK CONVENTION TRUST

Charity number: 1083584
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £2,052,152 £2,461,842 £3,388,076 £2,008,604 £3,358,710
Total expenditure £1,342,827 £1,489,915 £1,673,773 £1,809,104 £1,891,054