MECHANICS FOR AFRICA

Charity number: 1086333
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £85,011 £82,285 £71,251 £122,232 £137,553
Total expenditure £72,075 £57,252 £103,881 £97,188 £131,720