IVY STREET FAMILY CENTRE TRUST

Charity number: 1088854
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £35,029 £41,159 £81,585 £52,462 £42,086
Total expenditure £42,251 £56,796 £59,602 £76,076 £62,032