THE EXETER & DISTRICT CLASSICAL MUSIC TRUST

Charity number: 1090945
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Other income £44,400 £46,654 £47,755 £51,037 £59,083
Total expenditure £45,574 £43,504 £55,550 £42,211 £53,081