VICTORIA PARK HARRIERS AND TOWER HAMLETS AC

Charity number: 1091712
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £10,299 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10,299 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £58,028 £58,028 £72,346 £73,906 £64,692
Total expenditure £107,817 £107,817 £106,877 £110,665 £48,773