NORWICH INTERNATIONAL YOUTH PROJECT

Charity number: 1099039
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £30,766 £47,269 £20,468 £38,370 £33,802
Total expenditure £43,334 £49,021 £24,992 £31,801 £33,728