SHEWULA HEALTH INTERGRATION PROJECT (SHIP)

Charity number: 1100607
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
30/09/2015 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Other income £5,750 £5,552 £6,210 £20,050 £4,124
Total expenditure £6,612 £5,948 £6,257 £5,673 £4,969