BRIDGETOWN ALIVE

Charity number: 1103636
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Other income £1,450 £1,862 £5,730 £842 £4,956
Total expenditure £569 £3,247 £58 £6,317 £1,255