FRONT LINE EMERGENCY EQUIPMENT TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1107582
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Other income £182,308 £229,210 £215,905 £146,294 £154,016
Total expenditure £193,287 £229,865 £200,531 £166,740 £116,942