HINDU WELFARE ASSOCIATION OF ESSEX

Charity number: 1111503
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £500 £10,500 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £104,587 £63,407 £81,497 £63,163 £67,115
Total expenditure £44,252 £34,511 £43,273 £31,495 £39,184