ACTIVE LIGHTWORKS LTD

Charity number: 1114800
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
28/02/2015 28/02/2016 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Other income £1,594 £1,930 £6,299 £9,758 £8,823
Total expenditure £1,723 £1,933 £6,319 £8,316 £9,624