DORSET SEARCH & RESCUE (DORSAR)

Charity number: 1121658
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 £0 £2,572
Other income £12,751 £19,692 £33,241 £23,404 £21,536
Total expenditure £14,705 £27,732 £26,350 £19,047 £33,240