UNDER TREE SCHOOLS

Charity number: 1117679
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Other income £91.27k £86.72k £70.48k £71.58k £53.59k
Total expenditure £80.10k £97.73k £79.68k £78.50k £37.08k