BILLINGSHURST EMERGENCY ASSISTANCE TEAM

Charity number: 1119641
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/01/2015 31/01/2016 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Other income £5.98k £19.39k £8.23k £1.97k £752
Total expenditure £2.99k £10.11k £7.01k £7.48k £3.77k