KIDZ KLUB BRIGHTON & HOVE

Charity number: 1126869
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £86,328 £99,839 £124,922 £124,893 £151,465
Total expenditure £84,965 £100,785 £115,077 £122,014 £134,401