MOXAFRICA

Charity number: 1128408
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
30/06/2015 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £19,879 £18,736 £11,703 £21,891 £18,169
Total expenditure £21,294 £20,838 £17,127 £24,444 £20,756