SOUTH HARFORD & TUCKSWOOD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1126830
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £38,542 £27,070 £29,586 £52,553 £62,846
Total expenditure £22,644 £24,859 £27,274 £34,639 £70,231