THE GROW OLD DISGRACEFULLY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1131498
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
30/06/2015 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Other income £22,967 £9,532 £3,532 £4,929 £6,470
Total expenditure £5,000 £0 £6,397 £151 £6,287